Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0767531

EP0767531 - A microwave oscillation circuit and a down converter using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP
Former [1997/15]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kashima, Yukiro
1-7-10-501, Tsukahara
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
02 / Morino, Takayoshi, 411 Goody Tsunashima
2-11-15 Tsunashima Nishi, Kohoku-Ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP
[1997/15]
Representative(s)Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/15]Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date96305054.709.07.1996
[1997/15]
Priority number, dateJP1995019553631.07.1995         Original published format: JP 19553695
[1997/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0767531
Date:09.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0767531
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:H03B5/18, H03D9/06
[1997/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/15]
TitleGerman:Mikrowellen-Oszillator und diesen verwendender Abwärts-Umsetzer[1997/15]
English:A microwave oscillation circuit and a down converter using the same[1997/15]
French:Oscillateur hyperfréquence et convertisseur de fréquence l'utilisant[1997/15]
Examination procedure18.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/26]
09.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.1999Fee for grant paid
08.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4435688  (SHINKAWA KEIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * column 1, lines 15-45; figure 1 *;
 [YA]US4618836  (GANNON MARK A [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-3 * [A] 3,6;
 [YA]EP0638818  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 57; figures 1,3-5 * [A] 6;
 [A]EP0505963  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 53; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US4591806  (HAVENS RICHARD C [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 11; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]JPS5964904  ;
 [A]JPS6025308  ;
 [A]US5272525  (BORCHARDT ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 4-6 * column W *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840802), vol. 008, no. 167, Database accession no. (E - 258), [A] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850618), vol. 009, no. 143, Database accession no. (E - 322), [A] 1-3 * abstract *