Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0761948

EP0761948 - Fuel control system for gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lucas Industries Limited
46 Park Street
London W1Y 4DJ / GB
[2000/04]
Former [1997/11]For all designated states
LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company
Stratford Road
Solihull, West Midlands B90 4LA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Smith, Trevor Stanley
3, Streather Road
Four Oaks, Sutton Coldfield, B75 6RB / GB
[1997/11]
Representative(s)Robinson, John Stuart
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street
Queensway, Birmingham
B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/11]Robinson, John Stuart
MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham, B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date96305313.719.07.1996
[1997/11]
Priority number, dateGB1995001858209.09.1995         Original published format: GB 9518582
[1997/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0761948
Date:12.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0761948
Date:30.07.1997
[1997/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0761948
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:F02C9/28, F02C9/46
[1997/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/11]
TitleGerman:Brennstoffregeleinrichtung für Gasturbine[1997/11]
English:Fuel control system for gas turbine engine[1997/11]
French:Système de contrôle de carburant pour turbine à gaz[1997/11]
Examination procedure15.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/12]
21.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2000Fee for grant paid
05.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0436513  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6;
 [XY]EP0399437  (COLT IND INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 6;
 [XY]GB2125185  (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 5;
 [A]FR2401321  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2788063  (WRIGHT ALEXANDER M) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4760662  (DYER GERALD P [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4716723  (RALSTON RUSSELL B [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *