Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0755162

EP0755162 - Recording and/or reproducing video data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2005
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.10.2005  [2005/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/04]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Murase, Hirofumi, Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / Kajimoto, Masato, Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
03 / Yamamoto, Toshihisa, Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
[1997/04]
Representative(s)DeVile, Jonathan Mark , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/50]DeVile, Jonathan Mark , et al
D. Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [1997/04]Cotter, Ivan John , et al
D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date96305324.419.07.1996
[1997/04]
Priority number, dateJP1995020777821.07.1995         Original published format: JP 20777895
[1997/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0755162
Date:22.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0755162
Date:23.04.1997
[1997/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0755162
Date:27.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/806
[1997/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/04]
TitleGerman:Aufnahme und/oder Wiedergabe von Fernsehdaten[1997/04]
English:Recording and/or reproducing video data[1997/04]
French:Enregistrement et/ou reproduction de données vidéo[1997/04]
Examination procedure15.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/46]
02.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2004Fee for grant paid
28.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0651553  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-3,6,7 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 7 - line 30 *;
 [A]EP0390421  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5018017  (SASAKI MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 3 * * column 6, line 1 - line 26 * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 4 *;
 [PX]US5528293  (WATANABE MIKIO [JP]) [PX] 1 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0594992  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 2-10 * column 65, line 18 - column 66, line 8 * * column 118, line 37 - column 120, line 49; figure 43 * * column 127, line 13 - column 128, line 22 * * column 132, line 10 - line 30 *;
 [A]US5226145  (MORONAGA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 2-4 * column 8, line 32 - line 44 * * column 12, line 34 - column 13, line 9; figure 14 *;
 [A]JPH0490280
 [X]  - WATANABE ET AL., "An Image Data File Format for Digital Still Camera", DATABASE INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002026026 [X] 1 * abstract *
    [] - FINAL PROGRAM AND ADVANCE PRINTING OF PAPERS, IS&T'S 48TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE. IMAGING ON THE INFORMATION SUPERHIGHWAY, PROCEEDINGS OF 48TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE SOCIETY FOR IMAGING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, WASHINGTON DC, USA, (19950507), pages 421 - 424,
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920710), vol. 16, no. 316, Database accession no. (E - 1231), [A] 6 * abstract *