Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0757226

EP0757226 - Automatic inspection method for contactlessly measuring an offset of a central feature of an object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.06.2003  [2003/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T IPM Corp.
2333 Ponce de Leon Boulevard Coral Gables
Florida 33134 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/06]For all designated states
AT&T IPM Corp.
2333 Ponce de Leon Boulevard
Coral Gables, Florida 33134 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Csipkes, Andrei
2737 Springfount Circle
Lawrenceville, Georgia 30243 / US
02 / Palmquist, John Mark
5033 Arbor Lane
Lilburn, Georgia 30247 / US
[1997/06]
Representative(s)Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue
Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/06]Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date96305374.923.07.1996
[1997/06]
Priority number, dateUS1995051022602.08.1995         Original published format: US 510226
[1997/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0757226
Date:05.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0757226
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0757226
Date:12.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/00, G02B6/38, G06T7/60
[2000/05]
Former International [1997/06]G01B11/00, G02B6/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT,   NL [1997/06]
TitleGerman:Automatisches Prüfverfahren zum berührungslosen Messen der Ablage eines Mittelpunktmerkmals eines Objekts[1997/06]
English:Automatic inspection method for contactlessly measuring an offset of a central feature of an object[1997/06]
French:Procédé d'inspection, automatique pour mesurer sans contact le décalage d'une caractéristique centrale d'un objet[1997/06]
Examination procedure21.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
28.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2002Fee for grant paid
09.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0380722  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6,8 * column 11, line 25 - line 58 * * column 12 - column 14 * * column 15, line 1 - line 57 * * figures 11,12,16,18,19 *;
 [A]EP0542251  (SIP [IT]) [A] 1,2,5,6,8 * page 2, line 1 - line 58 * * page 3, line 1 - line 18 * * page 5, line 8 - line 25 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US5408309  (SHIMADA TADAKATSU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,8 * column 2, line 62 - line 68 * * column 3 - column 7 * * column 8, line 1 - line 44 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5045678  (ESSER HILDEGARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,8 * page - *;
 [AD]US4738508  (PALMQUIST JOHN M [US]) [AD] 1,2,5,6,8 * column 6, line 41 * * column 7 - column 8 * * column 9, line 1 - line 49 * * figures 5.8,10-17; claim - *
ExaminationUS4882497