Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0801118

EP0801118 - Black to color bleed control using cationic surfactants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [1997/42]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rehman, Zia
3010 NE Glacier Way
Corvallis, OR 97330 / US
[1997/42]
Representative(s)Colgan, Stephen James , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/42]Colgan, Stephen James , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date96305840.908.08.1996
[1997/42]
Priority number, dateUS1996063151111.04.1996         Original published format: US 631511
[1997/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0801118
Date:15.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0801118
Date:29.10.1997
[1997/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0801118
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/00
[1997/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/42]
TitleGerman:Schwarz-Farbe Auslaufbeschränkung unter Verwendung von kationischen Tensiden[1997/42]
English:Black to color bleed control using cationic surfactants[1997/42]
French:Contrôle des bavures du noir sur la couleur en utilisant des agents tensioactifs cationiques[1997/42]
Examination procedure03.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/23]
12.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.1999Fee for grant paid
19.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0663299  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 1 - line 30 * * page 3, line 56 - page 10, line 23; claims 1-8,17-23 *;
 [A]EP0425439  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 50 - page 3, column 3, line 13; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]EP0404494  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 43 * * page 6, line 53 - page 9, line 10; claims 1,510,12 *;
 [A]EP0697445  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 1 - line 27 * * page 3, line 53 - page 8, line 33; claims 1-5,11-16 *;
 [A]EP0633142  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 22 - page 7, line 40; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH0820162
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 096, no. 005, [A] 1 * abstract *