Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0760426

EP0760426 - A fuel pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FORD MOTOR COMPANY
The American Road
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/10]For all designated states
Ford Motor Company
The American Road
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gaston, Robert Duane
4472 Monroe Boulevard
Dearborn Heights, Michigan 48125 / US
02 / Yu, DeQuan
3093 North Foxridge Court
Ann Arbor, Michigan 48105 / US
[1997/10]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/10]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date96305849.009.08.1996
[1997/10]
Priority number, dateUS1995052148830.08.1995         Original published format: US 521488
[1997/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0760426
Date:05.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0760426
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:F04D5/00, F04D29/18, F04D29/66
[1997/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/10]
TitleGerman:Kraftstoffpumpe[1997/10]
English:A fuel pump[1997/10]
French:Pompe à carburant[1997/10]
Examination procedure08.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/41]
18.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.2003Fee for grant paid
02.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
09.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US5310308  (YU DEQUAN [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 41 - line 46 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 3; figure -; claim 13 *;
 [A]GB2220706  (CARADON MIRA LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 17; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0563957  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 1; figure - *;
 [A]EP0601530  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,6-8 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4328268  (PIERBURG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3811990  (SPECK PUMPENFABRIK WALTER SPEC [DE]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * page 3, line 22 - line 39 *;
 [A]DE8703840U  (BOSCH) [A] 1,10 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4314515  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - line 60; figure 2 *;
 [A]JPS58210394
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840315), vol. 008, no. 057, Database accession no. (M - 283), [A] * abstract *