Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0767419

EP0767419 - Method and system in a data processing system windowing environment for displaying previously obscured information [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/15]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kaply, Michael Aaron
1865 Palm Cove Blvd. No.307
Delray Beach, Florida 33445 / US
02 / Martinez, Anthony Edward
1290 Cypress Way
Boca Raton, Florida, 33486 / US
[1997/15]
Representative(s)Burt, Roger James
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/15]Burt, Roger James, Dr.
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date96305851.609.08.1996
[1997/15]
Priority number, dateUS1995051666318.08.1995         Original published format: US 516663
[1997/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0767419
Date:09.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0767419
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/033, G06F9/44
[1997/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/15]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Darstellung von vorher verborgenen Informationen in einer Rechnerfensterumgebung[1997/15]
English:Method and system in a data processing system windowing environment for displaying previously obscured information[1997/15]
French:Méthode et système pour afficher les informations préalablement occultées dans un environnement de fenêtres informatiques[1997/15]
Examination procedure27.08.1996Examination requested  [1997/15]
27.08.1996Request for accelerated examination filed
22.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.1997Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
25.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1997Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
09.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.1999Fee for grant paid
06.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination30.06.1997Appeal received No.  T0935/97
07.08.1997Statement of grounds filed
04.02.1999Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
19.03.1998Date of oral proceedings
23.03.1998Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0605945  (FIRSTPERSON INC) [A] 1,6,8,9 * page 7, line 54 - page 8, line 5; figures 4,6 *;
 [A]  - KALTENBACH M ET AL, "Screen management in hypertext systems with rubber sheet layouts", THIRD ACM CONFERENCE ON HYPERTEXT, PROCEEDINGS OF HYPERTEXT '91, SAN ANTONIO, TX, USA, ISBN 0-89791-461-9, 1991, NEW YORK, NY, USA, ACM, USA, (19911215), pages 91 - 105, XP000603909 [A] 1,6,8,9 * column A *