Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0767419 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0767419



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 388
20.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.11.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
06.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
22.10.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
15.10.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.07.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
09.07.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
01.07.1999 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 4
25.06.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
04.03.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.03.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.03.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 29
04.02.1999 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 42
23.03.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.03.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.03.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 11
19.03.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.03.1998 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
05.03.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
27.02.1998 Note on telephone consultation Appeal 1
21.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
13.02.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
13.02.1998 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
10.02.1998 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.12.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.09.1997 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
18.09.1997 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
07.08.1997 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
30.06.1997 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
30.06.1997 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 34
28.06.1997 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
18.06.1997 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 17
12.06.1997 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.05.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
07.05.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.04.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
26.02.1997 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.02.1997 Claims Search / examination 4
25.02.1997 Description Search / examination 2
25.02.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.01.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
05.11.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.11.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
09.08.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.08.1996 Claims Search / examination 4
09.08.1996 Description Search / examination 18
09.08.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.08.1996 Drawings Search / examination 11
09.08.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
09.08.1996 Priority document Search / examination 50
09.08.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6