Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0762458

EP0762458 - Plate fuse and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi
Mie-ken / JP
For all designated states
Harness System Technologies Research, Ltd.
7-10, Kikusumi 1-chome, Minami-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/11]For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP
For all designated states
Harness System Technologies Research, Ltd.
7-10, Kikusumi 1-chome, Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Saitoh, Yasushi
Harness Sys.Techn.Res. Ltd., 7-10 Kikusumi 1-chome
Minami-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Yasukuni, Jun
Sumitomo Wiring Sys., Ltd., 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP
[1997/11]
Representative(s)Spall, Christopher John
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/11]Spall, Christopher John
BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road
Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date96305924.113.08.1996
[1997/11]
Priority number, dateJP1995024865201.09.1995         Original published format: JP 24865295
JP1995028654805.10.1995         Original published format: JP 28654895
[1997/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0762458
Date:12.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0762458
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01H85/041, H01H69/02
[1997/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/11]
TitleGerman:Sicherungsplatte und Verfahren zur Herstellung der Sicherungsplatte[1997/11]
English:Plate fuse and method of producing the same[1997/11]
French:Plaque à fusible et procédé de fabrication de la plaque à fusible[1997/11]
Examination procedure09.09.1996Examination requested  [1997/11]
30.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.1999Fee for grant paid
16.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE3530354  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [Y] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE8801878U  (AKYÜREK) [Y] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE368034  (WILHELM PUDENZ) [Y] 1,3-5 * column W *;
 [Y]JPH0785771  ;
 [Y]DE1803554  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC) [Y] 1,4,7,8,10 * page 9, paragraph 1 * * figures 7,8 * * claims 1,3 *;
 [Y]US4149137  (KONNEMANN ALFRED) [Y] 1,4,7,8,10 * column W *;
 [A]FR2180918  (MB METALS LTD [GB]);
 [A]DE368033  (WILHELM PUDENZ);
 [AD]JPS5638959U  (-)
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 95, no. 003, [Y] 1,3-5 * abstract *