Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0758834

EP0758834 - Low cost night vision camera for vehicles and mounting thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAYTHEON COMPANY
PO Box 902
2000 East El Segundo Blvd.
El Segundo
California 90245 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/49]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
PO Box 902, 2000 El Segundo Blvd.
El Segundo, California 90245 / US
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
7200 Hughes Terrace
Los Angeles, CA 90080-0028 / US
Former [1997/08]For all designated states
HE HOLDINGS, INC. dba HUGHES ELECTRONICS
7200 Hughes Terrace
Los Angeles, CA 90045-0066 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Salvio, Paul
30822 Rue de la Pieere
Palos Verdes Estate, California 90274 / US
02 / Walsh, Kevin
5427 West 118th Street
Delaire, California 90304 / US
[1997/08]
Representative(s)Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1998/49]Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1997/08]Jackson, Richard Eric
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date96305935.714.08.1996
[1997/08]
Priority number, dateUS1995051455014.08.1995         Original published format: US 514550
[1997/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0758834
Date:19.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0758834
Date:16.04.1997
[1997/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0758834
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/18, H04N5/33
[1999/36]
Former International [1997/08]H04N7/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/08]
TitleGerman:Kostengünstiges Nachsichtgerät für Fahrzeuge und Verfahren zur Montage[1997/08]
English:Low cost night vision camera for vehicles and mounting thereof[1997/08]
French:Caméra de vision nocturne à faible coût pour véhicules et procédé de montage[1997/08]
Examination procedure22.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/47]
21.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.1999Fee for grant paid
19.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4277804  (ROBISON ELBURN) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, line 24 - line 32; figure 2 *;
 [DY]US5001558  (BURLEY HARVEY A [US], et al) [DY] 1 * column 2, line 8 - line 63; figure 2 *;
 [Y]EP0640903  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [Y] 1 * page 4, line 17 - line 31 *;
 [Y]US5414439  (GROVES DOYLE J [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 38 - line 56; figure 1 *;
 [DPA]EP0677955  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [DPA] 1 * page 2, line 29 - line 47; figures 1A,1B *