EP0760424 - Gaseous fuel direct injection system for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orbital Engine Company (Australia) Pty Limited 1 Whipple Street Balcatta Western Australia 6021 / AU | For all designated states Meteor 5550 Occidental Tecumseh Michigan / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states Orbital Engine Company (Australia) Pty Limited 1 Whipple Street Balcatta Western Australia 6021 / AU | ||
For all designated states Meteor 5550 Occidental Tecumseh, Michigan / US | |||
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states ORBITAL ENGINE COMPANY PROPRIETARY LIMITED 1 Whipple Street Balcatta Western Australia 6021 / AU | ||
For all designated states Meteor 5550 Occidental Tecumseh, Michigan / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hill, Raymond John 4 Heartleap Lane Beldon, W.A.6027 / AU | 02 /
Ahern, Steven Ross 7 Corry Lynn Road Claremont W.A. 6010 / AU | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306027.2 | 19.08.1996 | [1997/10] | Priority number, date | AU1995PN00048 | 18.08.1995 Original published format: AU PN004895 | [1997/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0760424 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0760424 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760424 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02D19/02 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
F02B43/00 (EP,US);
F02D19/024 (EP,US);
F02D19/026 (EP,US);
F02M21/0212 (EP,US);
F02M21/0275 (EP,US);
F02M21/06 (EP,US);
F02M65/008 (EP,US);
F02B2075/025 (EP,US);
F02B2075/125 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1997/10] | Title | German: | Direkteinspritzsystem für gasförmigen Brennstoff für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1997/10] | English: | Gaseous fuel direct injection system for internal combustion engines | [1997/10] | French: | Système à injection directe de carburant gazeux pour moteurs à combustion interne | [1997/10] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 25.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07166873 ; | [Y]JPS60184937 ; | [A]JPS63277847 ; | [X]US4306526 (SCHAUB FRED S, et al) [X] 1,37,41 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP0159429 (WESTERMAN HOWARD G [US]) [A] 1-51 * figures 2,5 *; | [X]US4574754 (RHOADES JR WARREN A [US]) [X] 1,41 * column 9, line 13 - line 20 * * column 12, line 16 - line 32; figures 1,10,11 *; | [A]US4774909 (DOLDERER ERICH A [DE]) [A] 1-51 * column 4, line 8 - line 10 * * column 6, line 11 - line 18 *; | [XY]EP0320959 (URBAN TRANSPORTATION DEV [CA]) [X] 1-10,41 * column 2, line 22 - line 39 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 11 * * abstract * [Y] 11; | [A]US5067467 (HILL PHILIP G [CA], et al) [A] 1-51 * column 5, line 3 - line 13 * * column 6, line 29 - line 61 *; | [A]EP0480545 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO [JP]); | [A]EP0520659 (WAERTSILAE DIESEL INT [FI]); | [X]WO9323662 (UNITED FUELS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,41 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 11; figure 2 *; | [A]US5329908 (TARR YUL J [US], et al); | [A]US5394852 (MCALISTER ROY E [US]) [A] 1-51 * column 2, line 33 - line 35; claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 095, no. 009, & JP07166873 A 19950627 (NIPPON CLEAN ENGINE LAB CO LTD) [X] 1,41 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860205), vol. 010, no. 029, Database accession no. (M - 451), & JP60184937 A 19850920 (KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KK) [Y] 11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890222), vol. 013, no. 077, Database accession no. (M - 801), & JP63277847 A 19881115 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-51 * abstract * |