Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0760206

EP0760206 - Synergistic antimicrobial composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CALGON CORPORATION
5400 Campbells Run Road Pittsburgh
Pennsylvania 15205 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/10]For all designated states
Calgon Corporation
5400 Campbells Run Road
Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15205 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Stinavage, Paul
7144 Boyers Mill Road
New Market, MO 21774 / US
[1997/10]
Representative(s)Geissler, Bernhard , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]Geissler, Bernhard, Dr. jur., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [1997/27]McCormack, Derek James
ECC International Ltd, Patents Department, c/o John Keay House
St Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB
Former [1997/10]McCormack, Derek James
English China Clays plc 1015 Arlington Business Park Theale
Reading, Berkshire RG7 4SA / GB
Application number, filing date96306316.930.08.1996
[1997/10]
Priority number, dateUS1995052169831.08.1995         Original published format: US 521698
[1997/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0760206
Date:05.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0760206
Date:17.12.1997
[1997/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0760206
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:A01N37/34, A01N47/44, // (A01N37/34, 47:44)
[1997/51]
Former International [1997/10]A01N37/34, A01N47/44
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1997/10]
TitleGerman:Synergistische antimikrobielle Zusammensetzung[1997/10]
English:Synergistic antimicrobial composition[1997/10]
French:Composition antimicrobienne synergique[1997/10]
Examination procedure15.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/12]
01.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.1999Fee for grant paid
08.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0472311  (BETZ EUROP INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5034405  (JAKUBOWSKI JOHN A [US]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0593250  (CALGON CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 25 - line 44; claim 1 *
by applicantUS3833731
 US3877922
 US3873597
 US3644380
 US3833743
 US3929858
 US4442122
 US4496581
 US4830657
 US5034405
 US5124355
 US5364874
 US2867562
 US2906595
 US3116326
 US3142615
 US3143459
 US3264172
 US3628941