blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0764878

EP0764878 - Photothermographic elements comprising hydroxamic acid developers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
Former [1997/13]For all designated states
Imation Corp.
1 Imation Place
Oakdale, MN 55128 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sansbury, Francis H.
14 Leat Close
Sawbridgeworth, Herts. CM21 9LZ / GB
02 / Oliff, David B.
22 Roseacres, Takeley
Bishops Stortford, Herts. CM22 6QZ / GB
03 / Grieve, Duncan McL. A.
10 Churchfield
Saffron Walden, Essex CB11 4BG / GB
[1997/13]
Representative(s)Bowman, Paul Alan
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/13]Bowman, Paul Alan
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date96306556.010.09.1996
[1997/13]
Priority number, dateGB1995001908519.09.1995         Original published format: GB 9519085
[1997/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0764878
Date:26.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0764878
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.1996
ClassificationIPC:G03C1/498
[1997/13]
CPC:
G03C1/49827 (EP); C09B23/086 (EP); G03C1/49845 (EP);
G03C1/49881 (EP); G03C2200/43 (EP); G03C5/3035 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/13]
TitleGerman:Photothermographische Elemente, die Hydroxamsäure-Entwicklersubstanzen enthalten[1997/13]
English:Photothermographic elements comprising hydroxamic acid developers[1997/13]
French:Eléments photothermographiques comportant des développateurs d'acide hydroxamique[1997/13]
Examination procedure17.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/46]
23.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.02.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.1999Fee for grant paid
09.04.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE24.05.2000
CH24.05.2000
FR24.05.2000
IT24.05.2000
LI24.05.2000
NL24.05.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]BE24.05.2000
CH24.05.2000
FR24.05.2000
LI24.05.2000
NL24.05.2000
Former [2003/09]BE24.05.2000
CH24.05.2000
LI24.05.2000
NL24.05.2000
FR20.10.2000
Former [2002/02]BE24.05.2000
CH24.05.2000
LI24.05.2000
FR20.10.2000
Former [2001/24]BE24.05.2000
FR20.10.2000
Former [2001/11]BE24.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0616014  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [X] 1,14 * page 9, line 24 - line 34; examples 2,3,5 *;
 [DA]US3751252  (SMITH G ET AL) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4123282  (WINSLOW JOHN M) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.