Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0763614

EP0763614 - Bias-cut, knit cover for a belt, hose or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HIGHLAND INDUSTRIES, INC.
422 Gallimore Dairy Road
Greensboro, North Carolina 27409 / US
[1997/12]
Inventor(s)01 / McGee, James N., Jr.
500 Garden Loop
Pleasant Garden, North Carolina 27313 / US
02 / Wells, Darrel N.
204 Ridgeway Drive
Greensboro, North Carolina 27403 / US
[1997/12]
Representative(s)Warren, Anthony Robert , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/12]Warren, Anthony Robert , et al
BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date96306765.718.09.1996
[1997/12]
Priority number, dateUS1995052955018.09.1995         Original published format: US 529550
[1997/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0763614
Date:19.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0763614
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:D04B9/44, F16G5/06
[1997/12]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1997/12]
TitleGerman:Schräg geschnittener gestrichter Umhüllungsstoff für ein Riemen, Schlauch oder dergleiche[1997/12]
English:Bias-cut, knit cover for a belt, hose or the like[1997/12]
French:Tricot de recouvrement coupé en biais pour une courroie, tuyau ou similaire[1997/12]
Examination procedure12.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/46]
29.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
26.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2001Fee for grant paid
15.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination12.01.2001Appeal received No.  T0245/06
23.03.2001Statement of grounds filed
14.05.2001Interlocutory revision of appeal
14.05.2001Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal
15.10.2001Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M01) [2001/42]
22.10.2001Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2001/43]
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1107408  (DEERING MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION) [X] 1,6 * page 2, line 87 - line 105; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2239378  (BRILLHART) [A] 1,3,5,8 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 37; figures 3,4 *;
 [PA]US5520018  (WOOD) [PA] 1,3-6 * column 3, line 20 - line 33; figures 4,5 *;
 [DA]US3784427  (GRIFFIN);
 [DA]US3853017  (WHITE);
 [DA]US3981206  (MIRANTI)