Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0763614 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0763614



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 228
31.05.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.05.2005 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 10
22.04.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
08.04.2005 Communication (no form) Appeal 4
03.03.2005 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.03.2005 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.03.2005 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
01.03.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
21.02.2005 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
02.02.2005 Notification of decision Appeal 18
05.05.2004 Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.06.2003 Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
21.05.2003 Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.05.2003 Composition of the board Appeal 1
30.04.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.03.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 12
31.01.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
03.09.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
14.02.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.10.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
18.10.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
15.10.2001 Communication of the Legal Board of appeal Appeal 2
15.10.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.10.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.10.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.07.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
13.07.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.07.2001 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.06.2001 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
26.04.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
26.04.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
10.04.2001 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
09.04.2001 Decision on interlocutory revision Appeal 1
23.03.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
23.03.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
23.03.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
23.03.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
12.01.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.01.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.01.2001 Notice of appeal/statement of grounds Search / examination 2
02.12.2000 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
01.12.2000 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.11.2000 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 6
18.10.2000 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
02.06.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
02.06.2000 Description Search / examination 9
02.06.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.04.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.04.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.02.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.01.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
29.12.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
09.01.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.01.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
27.12.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.12.1996 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.10.1996 Drawings Search / examination 3
18.10.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.10.1996 Priority document Search / examination 26
18.09.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.09.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
18.09.1996 Description Search / examination 15
18.09.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.09.1996 Drawings Search / examination 3
18.09.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7