Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0767504

EP0767504 - Ultrasonic motor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Instruments Inc.
8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/15]For all designated states
SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC.
8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Iino, Akihiro, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
02 / Kasuga, Masao, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
03 / Suzuki, Makoto, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
04 / Suzuki, Kenji, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
05 / Saruwatari, Tomosumi, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome,Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
[1997/15]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/15]Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn
London WC1R 4JH / GB
Application number, filing date96307156.830.09.1996
[1997/15]
Priority number, dateJP1995025526902.10.1995         Original published format: JP 25526995
JP1996022875029.08.1996         Original published format: JP 22875096
[1997/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0767504
Date:09.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0767504
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01L41/04, H02N2/12
[1997/15]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI [1997/15]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für einen Ultraschallmotor[1997/15]
English:Ultrasonic motor device[1997/15]
French:Dispositif à moteur ultrasonique[1997/15]
Examination procedure20.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/42]
12.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
17.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
01.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.1999Fee for grant paid
17.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0650252  (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *