Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0769654

EP0769654 - Supplying heat to an externally fired power system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Exergy, Inc.
22320 Foothill Boulevard, Suite 540 Hayward
California 94541 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/17]For all designated states
Exergy, Inc.
22320 Foothill Boulevard, Suite 540
Hayward, California 94541 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kalina, Alexander I.
105 Glen Garry Way
Hillsborough, California 94010 / US
02 / Mirolli, Mark D.
22612 Sevilla Road
Hayward, California 94541 / US
[1997/17]
Representative(s)Ruffles, Graham Keith
Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/17]Ruffles, Graham Keith
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date96307555.117.10.1996
[1997/17]
Priority number, dateUS1995054641920.10.1995         Original published format: US 546419
[1997/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0769654
Date:23.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0769654
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:F22B31/00, F01K25/06
[1997/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/17]
TitleGerman:Wärmezufuhr für ein extern gefeuertes Kraftwerk[1997/17]
English:Supplying heat to an externally fired power system[1997/17]
French:Apport de chaleur à une centrale d'énergie[1997/17]
Examination procedure15.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/17]
13.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2000Fee for grant paid
04.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
CH26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
FI26.04.2000
FR26.04.2000
GR26.04.2000
LI26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
DE27.07.2000
IE17.10.2000
LU17.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2004/39]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
CH26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
FI26.04.2000
GR26.04.2000
LI26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
DE27.07.2000
FR22.09.2000
IE17.10.2000
LU17.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2004/07]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
CH26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
FI26.04.2000
GR26.04.2000
LI26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
DE27.07.2000
FR22.09.2000
IE17.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2003/09]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
CH26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
FI26.04.2000
LI26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
DE27.07.2000
FR22.09.2000
IE17.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2002/42]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
CH26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
FI26.04.2000
LI26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
DE27.07.2000
FR22.09.2000
IE17.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2002/26]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
CH26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
FI26.04.2000
LI26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
DE27.07.2000
FR22.09.2000
IE17.10.2000
Former [2002/17]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
CH26.04.2000
FI26.04.2000
LI26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
DE27.07.2000
FR22.09.2000
IE17.10.2000
Former [2002/13]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
CH26.04.2000
FI26.04.2000
LI26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
DE27.07.2000
FR22.09.2000
Former [2002/02]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
CH26.04.2000
FI26.04.2000
LI26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
FR22.09.2000
Former [2001/29]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
FI26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
FR22.09.2000
Former [2001/26]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
FR22.09.2000
Former [2001/16]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
FR22.09.2000
Former [2001/11]AT26.04.2000
BE26.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0325083  (SENER ING & SIST [ES]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 29; figure - *;
 [X]GB879032  (DUERRWERKE AG) [X] 1,2,6,8,11 * page 2, line 40 - line 90 *;
 [A]DE4034008  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 30; figure - *;
 [A]US4019465  (REGAN JOHN WILLIAM, et al) [A] 1,2,5 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]JPH0777302
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 95, no. 003, [A] * abstract *
by applicantUS5450821
 US4732005
 US4889545
 US3346561
 US4489563
 US5548043
 US4586340
 US4604867
 US4763480
 US4899545
 US4982568
 US5029444
 US5095708
 US5440882