Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0774501

EP0774501 - Cold sealable films and packages formed therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/21]Cold seal adhesives, cold sealable films and packages formed therewith
[1999/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASHLAND INC.
5200 Blazer Memorial Parkway Dublin
Ohio 43017 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
ASHLAND INC.
5200 Blazer Parkway
Dublin, Ohio 43017 / US
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
Ashland Chemical Company
5200 Blazer Parkway
Dublin, Ohio 43017 / US
Former [1997/21]For all designated states
Century International Adhesives and Coatings Corporation
802 Harmon Avenue
Columbus Ohio 43223 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Zhang, Tianhong
218 Park Street, No. 3
Rockport, Maine 04856 / US
[1997/21]
Representative(s)Marlow, Nicholas Simon
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/21]Marlow, Nicholas Simon
Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date96307963.704.11.1996
[1997/21]
Priority number, dateUS1995055984420.11.1995         Original published format: US 559844
[1997/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0774501
Date:21.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0774501
Date:02.09.1998
[1998/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0774501
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:C09J7/02, B65D65/40, C09J175/06, C08G18/08
[1998/36]
Former International [1997/21]C09J7/02, B65D65/40
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [1997/21]
TitleGerman:Kaltdichtende Filme und damit hergestellte Packungen[1999/41]
English:Cold sealable films and packages formed therewith[1999/41]
French:Films scellables à froid et leur utilisation en emballage[1999/41]
Former [1997/21]Kaltsiegelklebstoffe, kaltdichtende Filme und damit hergestellte Packungen
Former [1997/21]Cold seal adhesives, cold sealable films and packages formed therewith
Former [1997/21]Adhésifs d'étanchéité à froid, films scellables à froid et leur utilisation en emballage
Examination procedure01.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/17]
18.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2000Fee for grant paid
05.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR06.09.2000
[2006/32]
Former [2002/02]FR02.02.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9216576  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-9,22.23 * * page 21, paragraph 2 *;
 [DA]US4859521  (PIKE CHARLES O [US], et al) [DA] 1 * claims 1-5 *
by applicantUS4810745
 US4859521
 US4889884
 US4902370
 US4623416
 US4851459