blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0780666

EP0780666 - Measuring on-line tobacco rod basis weight using combined high accuracy/slow response and low accuracy/fast response gauges [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.04.2004  [2004/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Automation and Control Technology, Inc.
650 Ackerman Road
Columbus, OH 43202-2186 / US
[2003/10]
Former [1997/26]For all designated states
ABB INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS INC.
650 Ackerman Road
Columbus Ohio 43202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sturm, Steven P.
2104 Sumac Loop North
Columbus, Ohio 43229 / US
[1997/26]
Representative(s)Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/26]Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al
David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1AP / GB
Application number, filing date96308180.712.11.1996
[1997/26]
Priority number, dateUS1995057647221.12.1995         Original published format: US 576472
[1997/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0780666
Date:25.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0780666
Date:22.04.1998
[1998/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0780666
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1998
ClassificationIPC:G01G9/00, G01G17/02, A24C5/34, G01N23/12
[1998/18]
CPC:
G01N23/12 (EP,US); A24C5/3412 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1997/26]G01G9/00, G01G17/02, A24C5/34
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1997/26]
TitleGerman:On-line Messung des Basisgewichts eines Tabakstranges durch ein Messgerät mit hoher Genauigkeit/langsamer Reaktion und niedriger Genauigkeit/schneller Reaktion[2002/38]
English:Measuring on-line tobacco rod basis weight using combined high accuracy/slow response and low accuracy/fast response gauges[1997/26]
French:Mesure en ligne du poids de base de tiges de tabac combinant des indicateurs à haut rendement/réponse lente et bas rendement/réponse rapide[2002/37]
Former [1997/26]On-line Messung des Basisgewichts eines Tabakstrauges durch ein Messgerät mit hoher Genauigkeit/langsamer Reaktion und niedriger Genauigkeit/schneller Reaktion
Former [1997/26]Mesure on line du poids de base de tiges de tabac recourant à un indicateur à haut rendement/réponse lente et bas rendement/réponse rapide
Examination procedure13.10.1998Examination requested  [1998/50]
24.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2003Fee for grant paid
09.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Request for further processing for:20.06.2002Request for further processing filed
20.06.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.07.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
15.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3979581  (REULAND JOACHIM) [Y] 17* column 5, line 33 - column 7, line 30; figure 2 *;
 [X]WO9102945  (ABB PROCESS AUTOMATION INC [US]) [X] 1,4,8 * page 14, line 2 - line 6; figure 2 *;
 [XY]US5099118  (FRANCIS KENNETH E [US]) [X] 1,4,8 * column A * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 33 - line 36 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 28; figure 2 * [Y] 17
by applicantUS5125418
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.