EP0773653 - Method and apparatus for decoding Manchester-encoded data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, William A. 5113 Presidio Drive Garland, Texas 75043 / US | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Darby, David Thomas, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Darby, David Thomas, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308187.2 | 13.11.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | US19950006617 | 13.11.1995 Original published format: US 6617 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0773653 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0773653 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773653 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/49 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
H04L25/4904 (EP,US);
H03M5/12 (KR);
H04B10/5162 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Dekodierung von Manchester-kodierten Daten | [1997/20] | English: | Method and apparatus for decoding Manchester-encoded data | [1997/20] | French: | Procédé et appareil de décodage de données codées en code Manchester | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Request for further processing for: | 22.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2001 | 30.11.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.05.2004 | NL | 06.05.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/13] | NL | 06.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4292626 (SMITHLIN JOHN R) [X] 1-11,15,19,22-25 * column A * * column 4, line 7 - line 62 * * column 7, line 22 - line 41 * * figures 3-5 * [Y] 12-14,20,21; | [XA]US4361895 (KHOUDARI BENJAMIN M) [X] 1-11,22-25 * column A * * column 435529 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 19; | [XAY]EP0168770 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 14 * * page 9, line 7 - page 10, line 5 * * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 7 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 9,16,19,22,24,25 [Y] 12,13; | [YA]US4606052 (HIRZEL FREDERIC J [US], et al) [Y] 14,20,21 * column A * * column 20, line 3 - line 45 * * figure 2B * [A] 1-4,9,10,12,17,19,22-24; | [XA]GB2260883 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1-8,22,24,25 * abstract * * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 18 * * figures 1,2 *[A] 9,10,12,19 |