Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0781021

EP0781021 - Network congestion measurement method and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.02.2005  [2005/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1997/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Argentati, Merico Edward
6389 S. Jasmine Way
Englewood, CO 80111 / US
[1997/26]
Representative(s)Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue
Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/26]Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date96308725.903.12.1996
[1997/26]
Priority number, dateUS1995057641121.12.1995         Original published format: US 576411
[1997/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0781021
Date:25.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0781021
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/36, H04Q3/68
[1997/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/26]
TitleGerman:Netzblockierungsmessverfahren und Gerät dafür[1997/26]
English:Network congestion measurement method and apparatus therefor[1997/26]
French:Appareil et procédé de mesure de blocage de réseau[1997/26]
Examination procedure15.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
25.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/05]
02.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
01.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
22.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0398543  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-5,9-12,14-18 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 42 * * figures 12,13 * * page 19, line 50 - page 21, line 1 * * page 26, line 3 - line 26 * * page 28, line 45 - line 50 * [A] 6-8,13;
 [XA]EP0569913  (ALCATEL NV [NL]) [X] 1,4-6,11-15 * page 3, line 11 - line 16 * * page 5, line 3 - line 37 * * page 12, column 16 - page 13, column 23 * [A] 2,3,7-10,16-18;
 [DA]US5276425  (SWANSON CAROL J [US], et al) [DA] 1,7 * column 6, line 6 - line 15 * * column 11, line 42 - line 54 *
by applicantUS5450074
 US5276425
    CLOS C., "A Study of Non-Blocking Switching Networks.", THE BELL SYSTEM TECHNICAL JOURNAL., (195303), pages 406 - 432,
    PAULL M.D., "Reswitching of Connection Networks.", THE BELL SYSTEM TECHNICAL JOURNAL., (1962), vol. 41, pages 833 - 855, XP000647100
    YANG Y., "Nonblocking Broadcast Switching Networks.", JSSE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS., (199109), vol. 40, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1109/12.83662, pages 1005 - 1015, XP000263876

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/12.83662