blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0779514

EP0779514 - Reaction apparatus for automatic analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.04.2004  [2004/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOSOH CORPORATION
4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi
Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
Tosoh Corporation
4560, Kaisei-cho
Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP
Former [1997/25]For all designated states
Tosoh Corporation
4560, Kaisei-cho
Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishihara, Narihito
7-37-17-203, Sagamiohno
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Yoshida, Kiyofumi
5-4-29, Numama
Zushi-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Hayashi, Hidechika
3-7 Tokiwadai, Hodogaya-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1997/25]
Representative(s)Copsey, Timothy Graham, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]Copsey, Timothy Graham, et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [1997/25]Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al
KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street
London, WC1N 2DD / GB
Application number, filing date96308930.510.12.1996
[1997/25]
Priority number, dateJP1995032444613.12.1995         Original published format: JP 32444695
JP1996019459424.07.1996         Original published format: JP 19459496
[1997/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0779514
Date:18.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0779514
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:G01N35/04
[1997/25]
CPC:
G01N35/04 (EP,US); G01N2035/0456 (EP,US); Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/113332 (EP,US); Y10T436/114165 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/25]
TitleGerman:Reaktionsgerät für automatische Analysen[1997/25]
English:Reaction apparatus for automatic analysis[1997/25]
French:Appareil de réaction pour l'analyse automatique[1997/25]
Examination procedure07.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
18.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
09.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2003Fee for grant paid
24.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4363245  (SCHMID CARL J) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 16; figure - *;
 [A]US4879841  (SJOSTRAND JORGEN [DK]) [A] 1,2,4,8 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 18 *;
 [A]FR2235859  (SARRE MOISE [FR]) [A] 1,2 * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US4838453  (LUCKSTEAD JON D [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 13 *;
 [A]DE3415873  (AHRENS & BODE MASCH & APP [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 14, line 1 - page 18, line 6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.