Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0780404

EP0780404 - Improvement in fluidized bed reaction systems using unsupported catalyts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.04.1999
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.1999Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.06.1999 [1999/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury
Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/26]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Schreck, David James
5226 Sun Valley Drive
Cross Lanes, West Virginia 25313 / US
02 / Wenzel, Timothy Todd
888 Poplar Road
Charleston, West Virginia 25302 / US
03 / Goode, Mark Gregory
17 Meadowbrook Circle
Hurricane, West Virginia 25526 / US
04 / Williams, Clark Curtis
1105 Skytop Circle
Charleston, West Virginia 25314 / US
[1997/31]
Former [1997/29]01 / Schreck, David James
5226 Sun Valley Drive
Cross Lanes, 25313 West Virginia / US
02 / Wenzel, Timothy Todd
888 Poplar Road
Charleston, 25302 West Virginia / US
03 / Goode, mark Gregory
17 Meadowbrook Circle
Hurricane, 25526 West Virginia / US
04 / Williams, Clark Curtis
1105 Skytop Circle
Charleston, 25314 West Virginia / US
Representative(s)Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/26]Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date96309218.417.12.1996
[1997/26]
Priority number, dateUS1995000868318.12.1995         Original published format: US 8683
US1996076658912.12.1996         Original published format: US 766589
[1997/31]
Former [1997/26]US1995000868318.12.1995
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0780404
Date:25.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0780404
Date:29.12.1997
[1997/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/02, C08F2/34
[1997/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/26]
TitleGerman:Verbessertes Winkelschichtreaktionsverfahren unter Verwendung nicht-geträgerter Katalysatoren[1997/26]
English:Improvement in fluidized bed reaction systems using unsupported catalyts[1997/26]
French:Amélioration de systèmes réactionnels en lit fluidisé utilisant des catalyseurs nonsupportés[1997/26]
Examination procedure31.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/26]
20.04.1999Application withdrawn by applicant  [1999/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[YD]US4543399  (JENKINS III JOHN M [US], et al) [YD] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *;
 [YD]US5317036  (BRADY III ROBERT C [US], et al) [YD] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0659773  (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 6, lines 30-38 - page 7, lines 29-36 * * abstract *
by applicantUS4543399
 US5352749
 US5317036
 US5405922
 US5462999
 US4877587
 US4933149
 WO9428032
 US5437179
 US3298192
 US4621952
 US19950412964