Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0781039

EP0781039 - Audiovisual data recording and reproduction apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/26]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Norikazu, c/o Sony Corp. Int. Prop. Dept.
6-7-35, Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / Fujita, Hiroyuki, c/o Sony Corp. Int. Prop. Dept.
6-7-35, Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
03 / Kojima, Yuichi, c/o Sony Corp. Int. Prop. Dept.
6-7-35, Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
[1997/26]
Representative(s)Pratt, Richard Wilson , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/26]Pratt, Richard Wilson , et al
D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date96309238.218.12.1996
[1997/26]
Priority number, dateJP1995033370321.12.1995         Original published format: JP 33370395
[1997/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0781039
Date:25.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0781039
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/222, G11B27/031, H04N5/262
[1999/52]
Former International [1997/26]H04N5/222
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/26]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Aufnehmen und Wiedergeben von audiovisuellen Daten[1997/26]
English:Audiovisual data recording and reproduction apparatus[1997/26]
French:Dispositif d'enregistrement et de reproduction de données audiovisuelles[1997/26]
Examination procedure02.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
12.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/40]
08.05.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0667710  (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * column 5, line 35 - column 7, line 24 * [Y] 2-4;
 [XY]US5307456  (MACKAY MICHAEL T [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 6, line 3 - column 6, line 10 * * column 6, line 32 - column 6, line 49 * * column 9, line 15 - column 9, line 31; figures 17-22 * [Y] 2-4;
 [Y]EP0615244  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-4 * page 3, line 16 - page 3, line 47; figures 4,20,40 *;
 [Y]US4746994  (ETTLINGER ADRIAN B [US]) [Y] 2-4 * abstract * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 11; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9525400  (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,2,7,9 *;
 EP0715460  [ ] (SONY CORP [JP])