EP0726626 - Supply device for a gas mixture laser apparatus and laser apparatus provided with such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marie, Bruno 13 Nouveau Horizon F-78310 Elancourt / FR | 02 /
Guerin, Daniel Résidence du Val Fleuri, Bât. 33, Rue A.Bickart F-77500 Chelles / FR | 03 /
Larquet, Christian 55 rue Benoît Frachon F-78280 Guyancourt / FR | 04 /
Willemot, Antoine 1 rue du Maréchal Joffre F-92330 Sceaux / FR | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Mercey, Fiona Susan, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Mercey, Fiona Susan, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE, 75 quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400274.5 | 09.02.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | FR19950001546 | 10.02.1995 Original published format: FR 9501546 | [1996/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726626 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726626 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/036 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
H01S3/036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1996/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Versorgung eines Lasergerätes mit einer Gasmischung und ein mit einer solchen Vorrichtung versehenes Lasergerät | [2000/10] | English: | Supply device for a gas mixture laser apparatus and laser apparatus provided with such a device | [1996/33] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation d'un appareil laser à mélange gazeux et appareil laser muni d'un tel dispositif | [1996/33] |
Former [1996/33] | Vorrichtung zur Versorgung eines Lasergerätes mit eines Gasmischung und ein mit einer solchen Vorrichtung versehenes Lasergerät | Examination procedure | 14.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 17.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2000 | GB | 27.09.2000 | IT | 27.09.2000 | BE | 28.02.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/12] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
GB | 27.09.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
GB | 27.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/28] | GB | 27.09.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0384980 ; | [DA]EP0575206 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [DA] 1* abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910703), vol. 015, no. 261, Database accession no. (E - 1085), & JP03084980 A 19910410 (S.SETSUO ET AL.) [A] 1 * abstract * |