EP0730315 - Nickelelectrode for alcaline accumulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFT 156, avenue de Metz F-93230 Romainville / FR | [1996/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernard, Patrick 4, chemin de la Vieille Vigne 91300 Massy / FR | 02 /
Audry, Claudette 6, rue Normandie-Niemen 91300 Massy / FR | 03 /
Lecerf, André 34 avenue Le Brix 35740 Pace / FR | 04 /
Senyarich, Stephane 49/319 avenue de la Republique 77380 Combs la Ville / FR | [2000/23] |
Former [1996/36] | 01 /
Bernard, Patrick 4, chemin de la Vieille Vigne 91300 Massy / FR | ||
02 /
Audry, Claudette 6, rue Normandie-Niemen 91300 Massy / FR | |||
03 /
Lecerf, André 34 avenue le Brix 35740 Pace / FR | |||
04 /
Senyarich, Stephane 49/319 avenue de la Republique 77380 Combs la Ville / FR | Representative(s) | Laroche, Danièle, et al Compagnie Financière Alcatel Département Propriété Industrielle, 5, rue Noel Pons 92734 Nanterre Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Laroche, Danièle, et al c/o SOSPI 14-16 rue de la Baume 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400423.8 | 28.02.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | FR19950002504 | 03.03.1995 Original published format: FR 9502504 | [1996/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0730315 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0730315 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/52, H01M4/32, H01M4/76 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/1391 (EP,US);
H01M4/32 (EP,US);
H01M4/52 (EP,US);
H01M4/762 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/36] | Title | German: | Nickelelektrode für Alkaliakkumulator | [1996/36] | English: | Nickelelectrode for alcaline accumulator | [1996/36] | French: | Electrode au nickel pour accumulateur alcalin | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 25.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 07.06.2000 | IT | 07.06.2000 | SE | 07.09.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/27] | ES | 07.06.2000 | |
SE | 07.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | SE | 07.09.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0390677 (CENTRE NAT ETD SPATIALES [FR]) [XY] 1-3,5-8 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [XY]DE4429273 (TOSHIBA BATTERY [JP]) [XY] 1-3,5-8 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [XY]US5384216 (TERAOKA HIROHITO [JP], et al) [XY] 1-3,7,8 * column W * [Y] 4; | [XY]JPH0541213 ; | [Y]JPH04349353 ; | [XY]JPH04328257 ; | [XYY]JPH05290841 ; | [Y]JPH02262245 ; | [Y]JPS62234867 ; | [XY]DE4239295 (STARCK H C GMBH CO KG [DE]) [XY] 1 * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 14; example 1; claims 7,8,10,11 * [Y] 3,5-8; | [Y]JPH026340 ; | [Y]JPS60255632 ; | [Y]EP0353837 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5-8 * the whole document * | [YD] - B. C. CORNILSEN ET AL., "STRUCTURAL COMPARISON OF NICKEL ELECTRODES AND PRECURSOR PHASES", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, LAUSANNE, CH, (199002), vol. 29, no. 3/4, pages 453 - 466, XP000233860 [YD] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-7753(90)85018-8 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930624), vol. 17, no. 334, Database accession no. (E - 1387), & JP05041213 A 00000000 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) [XY] 1,7,8 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930403), vol. 17, no. 209, Database accession no. (E - 1355), & JP04349353 A 00000000 (YUASA BATTERY CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921117), vol. 17, no. 173, Database accession no. (E - 1345), & JP04328257 A 00000000 (TOSHIBA BATTERY CO., LTD.) [XY] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931105), vol. 18, no. 77, Database accession no. (E - 1504), & JP05290841 A 00000000 (HITACHI MAXELL LTD.) [XY] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 6-8 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910109), vol. 15, no. 9, Database accession no. (E - 1021), & JP02262245 A 00000000 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO., LTD.) [Y] 1,7,8 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880406), vol. 12, no. 106, Database accession no. (E - 596)<2953> , & JP62234867 A 00000000 (YUASA BATTERY CO., LTD.) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 90-054055, XP002000442 & JPH026340 A 00000000 (KANSAI SHOKUBAI KAG) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 86-033241, XP002000443 & JPS60255632 A 00000000 (SUMITOMO METAL MINI KK) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * |