Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0742195

EP0742195 - Process and installation for the conversion of C4 and C5 olefinic fractions into ethers and propylene [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2006Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 08.03.2006  [2006/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut Français du Pétrole
4, avenue de Bois Préau
92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
[2006/10]
Former [1996/46]For all designated states
INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE
4, avenue de Bois Préau
92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Chodorge, Jean-Alain
7, rue Germaine
92160 Antony / FR
02 / Commereuc, Dominique
32, rue Abel Vacher
92190 Meudon / FR
03 / Cosyns, Jean
50, route d'Herbeville
78580 Maule / FR
04 / Duee, Didier
28, rue des fonds Bleu
95610 Eragny sur Oise / FR
05 / Torck, Bernard
33 rue Vauthier
92100 Boulogne sur Seine / FR
[1996/46]
Representative(s)Hartmann, Günter , et al
RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Hartmann, Günter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date96400921.129.04.1996
[1996/46]
Priority number, dateFR1995000556111.05.1995         Original published format: FR 9505561
[1996/46]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0742195
Date:13.11.1996
Language:FR
[1996/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0742195
Date:20.09.2000
Language:FR
[2000/38]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0742195
Date:08.03.2006
Language:FR
[2006/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07C43/04, C07C11/06, C07C41/06, C07C6/04
[1996/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/46]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anlage zur Umsetzung von C4 und C5 olefinischen Fraktionen in Ether und Propylenen[1996/46]
English:Process and installation for the conversion of C4 and C5 olefinic fractions into ethers and propylene[1996/46]
French:Procédé et installation pour la conversion de coupes C4 et C5 oléfiniques en éther et en propylène[1996/46]
Examination procedure13.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/28]
13.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2000Fee for grant paid
26.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.06.2001  10.07.2001  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Isenbruck, Günter
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/06]
Opponent(s)01  20.06.2001  10.07.2001  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Isenbruck, Günter, Dr.
Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn, Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [2004/13]
Opponent(s)01  20.06.2001  10.07.2001  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Isenbruck, Günter (DE)
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
D-68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [2001/33]
Opponent(s)01  20.06.2001  10.07.2001  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Isenbruck, Günter, Dr.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
25.07.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.02.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.03.2003Date of oral proceedings
23.04.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.10.2005Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.11.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.12.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
07.01.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition01.07.2003Appeal received No.  T0705/03
03.09.2003Statement of grounds filed
06.10.2005Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
06.10.2005Date of oral proceedings
26.10.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5300718  (M. W. MCCAULLEY) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9408922  (DSM) [A] 1-25 * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 20; claim - *;
 [A]EP0605822  (STONE & WEBSTER ENGINEERING) [A] 1-25 * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 10; figures 1,3,4 *
OppositionUS5023389
 US4795732
    - S. Chaumette et al, Rev. Inst. Fr. Pet., 49(6), 1994, pp. 639-665