Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0742195 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0742195



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 994
25.01.2006 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
25.01.2006 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
25.01.2006 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
07.01.2006 Claims Opposition 6
07.01.2006 Claims Opposition 3
07.01.2006 English translation of the claims Opposition 6
07.01.2006 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
07.01.2006 German translation of the claims Opposition 7
07.12.2005 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
07.12.2005 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
07.12.2005 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
01.12.2005 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
30.11.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.11.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 32
26.10.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 20
05.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.10.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 18
05.10.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 2
05.10.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 16
04.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.10.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.10.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
30.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
30.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
30.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.09.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2005 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
12.09.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.09.2005 Claims Appeal 3
11.09.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
06.09.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
06.09.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
06.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
05.09.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
23.06.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.06.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
03.06.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.06.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.05.2005 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
10.05.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.05.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
02.05.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.05.2005 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.04.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.04.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.04.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.04.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.04.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.04.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
27.04.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.04.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
20.04.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.04.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
19.04.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
15.04.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
25.03.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.03.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.03.2004 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
11.03.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.03.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.02.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.01.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.01.2004 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
07.01.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.01.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
07.01.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.12.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.11.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.11.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.09.2003 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.09.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
03.09.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
03.09.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
03.09.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
03.09.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
03.09.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 27
01.08.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
11.07.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.07.2003 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
01.07.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
09.05.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.04.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.04.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
23.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
23.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 12
23.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
23.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
23.04.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
23.04.2003 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
23.04.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
23.04.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.04.2003 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.04.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 17
11.03.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
07.03.2003 Annex Opposition 1
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.03.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.02.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.02.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.02.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.02.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.02.2003 Annex Opposition 5
12.02.2003 Annex Opposition 3
12.02.2003 Claims Opposition 3
12.02.2003 Claims Opposition 3
12.02.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
11.02.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.02.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.02.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.01.2003 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
27.12.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.10.2002 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
23.08.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.08.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.08.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.08.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
20.08.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
12.08.2002 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.06.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.06.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.06.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.06.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.06.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.04.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
01.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.02.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
22.02.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
26.11.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.11.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.11.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
09.11.2001 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
25.07.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.07.2001 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
27.06.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.06.2001 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 15
20.06.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
20.06.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
10.08.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
08.06.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.06.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
08.06.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
16.03.2000 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
08.03.2000 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.11.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
29.11.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
15.10.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
09.09.1999 Description Search / examination 2
09.09.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.05.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.03.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.02.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.02.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.02.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.09.1996 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
09.08.1996 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.1996 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
30.07.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.07.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
30.07.1996 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
29.04.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.04.1996 Claims Search / examination 6
29.04.1996 Description Search / examination 24
29.04.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.1996 Drawings Search / examination 3
29.04.1996 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
29.04.1996 Priority document Search / examination 38
29.04.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6