Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0751108

EP0751108 - Process for the manufacture of difluoromethane [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2005Opposition rejectedpublished on 21.12.2005  [2005/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arkema
4-8 Cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
ARKEMA
4-8 Cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
Atofina
4/8 Cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
ELF ATOCHEM S.A.
4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10
92800 Puteaux, Hauts-de-Seine / FR
Former [1997/01]For all designated states
ELF ATOCHEM S.A.
4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10
92800 Puteaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Requieme, Benoît
225, Chemin de la Croix Bourguignon
69390 Charly / FR
02 / Perdrieux, Sylvain
707 Rue de la Maçonnière - Charly
69390 Vernaison / FR
03 / Cheminal, Bernard
Les Iris - 11, Chemin de Chauchère
69510 Saucieu-en-Jarrest / FR
04 / Lacroix, Eric
Le Bourg
69480 Amberieux D'Azergues / FR
05 / Lantz, André
Domaine de la Hêtraie
69390 Vernaison / FR
[2000/02]
Former [1997/01]01 / Requieme, Benoît
225, Chemin de la Croix Bourguignon
69390 Charly / FR
02 / Perdrieux, Sylvain
707 Rue de la Maçonnière - Charly
69390 Vernaison / FR
03 / Cheminal, Bernard
Les iris - 11, Chemin de Chauchère
69510 Saucieu-en-Jarrest / FR
04 / Lacroix, Eric
Le Bourg
69480 Amberieux D'Azergues / FR
05 / Lantz, André
Domaine de la Hêtraie
69390 Vernaison / FR
Representative(s)Hirsch & Associés
137, rue de l'Université
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/14]Cabinet Hirsch
34, Rue de Bassano
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2001/30]Marshall, Monica Anne
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [1997/01]Leboulenger, Jean
Elf Atochem S.A., Département Propriété Industrielle, Cedex 42 - La Défense 10
92091 Paris la Défense / FR
Application number, filing date96401151.429.05.1996
[1997/01]
Priority number, dateFR1995000782129.06.1995         Original published format: FR 9507821
[1997/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0751108
Date:02.01.1997
Language:FR
[1997/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0751108
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07C17/20, C07C19/08
[1997/01]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL [1997/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Difluormethan[1997/01]
English:Process for the manufacture of difluoromethane[1997/01]
French:Procédé de fabrication du difluorométhane[1997/01]
Examination procedure05.06.1996Examination requested  [1997/01]
27.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.1999Fee for grant paid
01.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.10.2000   
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US
Opponent's representative
Hucker, Charlotte Jane
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2000/49]
Opponent(s)01  12.10.2000   
Honeywell International, Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
Opponent's representative
Hucker, Charlotte Jane
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
16.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.11.2002Date of oral proceedings
04.12.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.04.2005Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/51]
31.05.2005Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition28.01.2003Appeal received No.  T0128/03
01.04.2003Statement of grounds filed
19.04.2005Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
19.04.2005Date of oral proceedings
26.04.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DY]JPS49134612  ;
 [Y]US3855151  (W.G. SCHINDEL) [Y] 1 * column W *;
 [Y]US3183276  (M. VECCHIO) [Y] 1 * claim - *;
 [Y]WO9421580  (IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC) [Y] 1 * claim - *
 [DY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 14, Database accession no. 75-23265W, XP002015042 & JPS49134612 A 19741225 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [DY] 1 * abstract *