Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0751108 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0751108



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 522
26.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
02.11.2005 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
31.05.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 23
26.04.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
30.03.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.03.2005 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
24.03.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.03.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.03.2005 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2005 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2005 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2005 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2005 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2005 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2005 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2005 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.03.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
16.03.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
08.03.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.03.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.02.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.02.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.02.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.11.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
11.11.2004 Request for change of name Search / examination 3
25.02.2004 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
31.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.10.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 19
22.10.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.10.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 37
20.10.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
25.08.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
21.08.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.08.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
09.04.2003 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.04.2003 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 16
02.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
02.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 37
02.04.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
01.04.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
17.02.2003 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 1
17.02.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
10.02.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
07.02.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.02.2003 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
31.01.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.01.2003 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.01.2003 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
30.01.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.01.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
16.01.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.12.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
04.12.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
04.12.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
04.12.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
04.12.2002 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
04.12.2002 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
04.12.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 11
04.12.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.10.2002 Claims Opposition 1
16.10.2002 Claims Opposition 1
16.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.10.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 18
16.10.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.07.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.04.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.02.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
06.02.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.02.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.01.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
30.01.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
30.01.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
25.01.2002 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.06.2001 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
11.06.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
05.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.05.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.05.2001 Annex Opposition 2
25.05.2001 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
25.05.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.05.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
23.05.2001 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
20.03.2001 Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting Opposition 1
20.03.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.11.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
16.11.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.10.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
13.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
13.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
13.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
12.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
12.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
02.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.09.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
01.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
12.07.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
02.07.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
21.05.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
08.02.1999 Description Search / examination 1
08.02.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.02.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
05.01.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.12.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.12.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.08.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.09.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
28.08.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.08.1997 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
27.02.1997 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
22.10.1996 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
11.10.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.10.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
29.05.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.05.1996 Claims Search / examination 1
29.05.1996 Description Search / examination 10
29.05.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.05.1996 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
29.05.1996 Priority document Search / examination 14
29.05.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6