Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0750268

EP0750268 - Neural diffusion network for creating variable receiving fields [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/52]Cell for electronic diffusion network for creating receiving fields in neural networks and network using the cell
[1999/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C.S.E.M. CENTRE SUISSE D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE MICROTECHNIQUE SA
Rue Jaquet-Droz 1
2007 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
C.S.E.M. CENTRE SUISSE D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE MICROTECHNIQUE SA
Rue Jaquet-Droz 1
2007 Neuchâtel / CH
Former [1996/52]For all designated states
C.S.E.M. CENTRE SUISSE D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE MICROTECHNIQUE SA
Jaquet-Droz 1
CH-2007 Neuchâtel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Venier, Philippe
Freiestrasse 57
2540 Grenchen / CH
[1996/52]
Representative(s)Caron, Gérard , et al
Cabinet JP COLAS 58 rue de Châteaudun
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/52]Caron, Gérard , et al
CABINET DE BOISSE, L.A. DE BOISSE - J.P. COLAS, 37 avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date96401358.520.06.1996
[1996/52]
Priority number, dateFR1995000757823.06.1995         Original published format: FR 9507578
[1996/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0750268
Date:27.12.1996
Language:FR
[1996/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0750268
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:G06G7/60
[1996/52]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1996/52]
TitleGerman:Neuronales Diffusionsnetz zur Erzeugung von variablen Empfangsfeldern[2000/03]
English:Neural diffusion network for creating variable receiving fields[1999/13]
French:Réseau de diffusion pseudo-axonique permettant de créer des champs récepteurs variables[1999/13]
Former [1996/52]Zelle für elektronisches Diffusionsnetzes zur Erzeugung von Empfangsfeldern in neuronalen Netzen und ihre Anwendung in einem Netz
Former [1996/52]Cell for electronic diffusion network for creating receiving fields in neural networks and network using the cell
Former [1996/52]Cellule pour réseau électronique de diffusion permettant de créer des champs récepteurs dans des réseaux pseudo-axoniques et réseau en comportant application
Examination procedure20.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/29]
07.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.1999Fee for grant paid
07.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0517097  (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-5,9-12 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 48; figures 2,3 *;
 [DA]  - P. HEIM, CMOS Analogue VLSI implementation of a Kohonen map, SUISSE, THÈSE NO 1174, ÉCOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FÉDÉRALE DE LAUSANNE, (1993), XP000579978 [DA] 1-12 * page 53 - page 66 *
 [A]  - HEIM ET AL., "Generation of learning neighbourhood in Kohonen feature meps by means of simple nonlinear network", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, STEVENAGE GB, (19910131), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 275 - 277, XP000208281 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BERNARD ET AL., "Design of a half-toning integrated circuit based on analog quadratic minimization by non linear multistage switched capacitor network", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, PROCEEDINGS, VOL. 2 OF 3, ESPOO, FINLAND, (19880607), pages 1217 - 1220, XP002014701 [A] 1 * page 1218, column L, line 25 - page 1219, column L, line 2; figures 1,2 *