EP0752621 - Frame-supported pellicle for photomask protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamada, Yuichi c/o Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd., 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-Ken / JP | 02 /
Kashida, Meguru c/o Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd., 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-Ken / JP | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [1997/02] | Application number, filing date | 96401439.3 | 28.06.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | JP19950169545 | 05.07.1995 Original published format: JP 16954595 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752621 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752621 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/14 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
G03F1/64 (EP,US);
H01L21/027 (KR);
Y10T428/249985 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/02] | Title | German: | Rahmengestützte Membranabdeckung zum Schutz einer Photomaske | [1997/02] | English: | Frame-supported pellicle for photomask protection | [1997/02] | French: | Pellicule supportée par un châssis pour la protection d'un photomasque | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 16.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0627644 ; | [A]JPH05150446 ; | [A]JPH04342257 ; | [A]JPH04212958 ; | [A]JPS63284551 ; | [A]JPH01154062 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940510), vol. 18, no. 244, Database accession no. (P - 1734), & JP06027644 A 19940204 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930929), vol. 17, no. 543, Database accession no. (P - 1622), & JP05150446 A 19930618 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRON CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930415), vol. 17, no. 194, Database accession no. (P - 1522), & JP04342257 A 19921127 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921130), vol. 16, no. 559, Database accession no. (P - 1455), & JP04212958 A 19920804 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890313), vol. 13, no. 104, Database accession no. (P - 842), & JP63284551 A 19881121 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890920), vol. 13, no. 422, Database accession no. (P - 933), & JP01154062 A 19890616 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 4 * abstract * |