Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0766913

EP0766913 - Method for treating soils by fumigation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/15]Film for treating soils by fumigation
[2000/22]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 15.12.2004  [2004/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atofina
4/8 Cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
[2000/34]
Former [1997/15]For all designated states
ELF ATOCHEM S.A.
4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10
92800 Puteaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Basset, Dominique
35 allée Fernand Léger
27300 Bernay / FR
02 / Corbic-Bellinger, Marie-Pierre
5 rue de Chatou
78800 Houilles / FR
03 / Echalier, Bruno
13 Bd de Montparnasse
75006 Paris / FR
[1997/15]
Representative(s)Neel, Henry
ARKEMA
Département Propriété Industrielle
4-8 Cours Michelet
La Défense 10
92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/15]Neel, Henry
Elf Atochem S.A., Dept. Propriété Industrielle, La Défense 10, Cedex 42
92091 Paris La Défense / FR
Application number, filing date96401953.312.09.1996
[1997/15]
Priority number, dateFR1995001169805.10.1995         Original published format: FR 9511698
[1997/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0766913
Date:09.04.1997
Language:FR
[1997/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0766913
Date:03.01.2001
Language:FR
[2001/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:A01G11/00, B32B27/32, C08L77/02, // (C08L77/02, 23:02)
[1997/15]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   PT [1997/15]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Begasungsbodenbehandlung[2000/22]
English:Method for treating soils by fumigation[2000/22]
French:Procédé de traitement des sols par fumigation[2000/22]
Former [1997/15]Film zur Begasungsbodenbehandlung
Former [1997/15]Film for treating soils by fumigation
Former [1997/15]Film pour le traitement des sols par fumigation
Examination procedure17.09.1996Examination requested  [1997/15]
27.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.07.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2000Fee for grant paid
01.09.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB03.01.2001
PT03.04.2001
GR06.04.2001
BE30.09.2001
[2004/51]
Former [2003/06]GB03.01.2001
PT03.04.2001
BE30.09.2001
Former [2002/27]GB03.01.2001
PT03.04.2001
Former [2002/12]GB03.01.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0380123  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * claims 1,11-14 *;
 [X]EP0613773  (WOLFF WALSRODE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 1, line 22 - line 49 *;
 [X]EP0277839  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * claim - *;
 [X]EP0268422  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * column W *;
 [XDY]EP0564338  (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [XD] 1,5 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 55; examples 1,2 * [Y] 2-4;
 [YA]US4819374  (GEMGNANI GREGORY [US]) [Y] 2 * column W * [A] 1;
 [D]EP0030793  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]);
 [YA]US4612221  (BIEL EDWARD N [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 37 * [A] 1;
 [A]EP0440557  (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [A] 1-5 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]JPS58211450  ;
 [AD]US5070145  (GUERDOUX LIONEL [FR]) [AD] 1 * example - *;
 [A]EP0595706  (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]);
 [AD]EP0342066  (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR])
 [A]  1, vol. 84, no. 04, Database accession no. 84-020646, XP002003124 [A] 1,3 * abstract *