blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0766939

EP0766939 - Opening/Closing device of a moving part in relation to a furniture frame and used with movable drawer cabinets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Piole-Parolai Equipement
Route de Saint Honoré
38350 La Mure d'Isère / FR
[1997/44]
Former [1997/15]For all designated states
ETABLISSEMENTS PIOLE S.A. Société dite
24, Rue Saint-Saens
80210 Feuquieres en Vimeu / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Chivot, Francis
3 rue du Cavin
80132 Miannay / FR
02 / Ozenne, Benoît
32 rue du Maréchal Leclerc
80570 Dargnies / FR
[1997/15]
Representative(s)Jacobson, Claude, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/15]Jacobson, Claude, et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date96402105.902.10.1996
[1997/15]
Priority number, dateFR1995001161103.10.1995         Original published format: FR 9511611
[1997/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0766939
Date:09.04.1997
Language:FR
[1997/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0766939
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0766939
Date:16.04.2003
Language:FR
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2000
ClassificationIPC:A47B88/04
[1997/15]
CPC:
A47B88/463 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   GR,   IT [1997/15]
TitleGerman:Öffnungs-/Schliessvorrichtung eines bewegenden Teiles in Bezug auf ein Möbelgehäuse und Anwendung bei bewegbaren Schubladenschränken[1997/15]
English:Opening/Closing device of a moving part in relation to a furniture frame and used with movable drawer cabinets[1997/15]
French:Dispositif d'ouverture-fermeture d'un élément mobile par rapport au bâti d'un meuble, et son application aux meubles déplaçables à tiroirs[1997/15]
Examination procedure28.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
06.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
30.09.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
25.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2003Fee for grant paid
07.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199904   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.1999
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB16.04.2003
IT16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2004/22]GB16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
Former [2004/02]GR16.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE3930271  (GEBR. HAPPICH GMBH) [DA] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5314243  (AUTOMATED HEALTHCARE INC) [A] 1,5-7 * column 4, line 11 - column 4, line 26; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US5435640  (WATERLOO INDUSTRIES INC) [A] 1 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.