Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0780746

EP0780746 - Monitoring system for a complex system, especially for an aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2001 [2001/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AEROSPATIALE MATRA
37, Boulevard de Montmorency
75016 Paris / FR
[2000/19]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Aerospatiale Matra
37, Boulevard de Montmorency
75016 Paris / FR
Former [1997/26]For all designated states
AEROSPATIALE SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE
37 boulevard de Montmorency
75016 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Lauta, Raymond
Les Portes du Colisée, 3, Rue Jean Viollis
31300 Toulouse / FR
02 / Lejarre Tatham, Lydie
14, Clos des Peupliers
31880 La Salvetat Saint Gilles / FR
[1997/26]
Representative(s)Bonnetat, Christian
Gevers France
41, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/26]Bonnetat, Christian
CABINET BONNETAT 29, rue de St. Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date96402659.509.12.1996
[1997/26]
Priority number, dateFR1995001535122.12.1995         Original published format: FR 9515351
[1997/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0780746
Date:25.06.1997
Language:FR
[1997/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0780746
Date:10.05.2000
Language:FR
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP08.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:G05D1/00, G07C3/00
[1997/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/26]
TitleGerman:Überwachungssystem für ein komplexes System, insbesondere für ein Flugzeug[1997/26]
English:Monitoring system for a complex system, especially for an aircraft[1997/26]
French:Dispositif de surveillance d'un système complexe, notamment d'un aéronef[1997/26]
Examination procedure22.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/38]
16.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2000Fee for grant paid
07.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0580474  (SEXTANT AVIONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 1, line 37 - column 3, line 40 * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 49 *;
 [A]US4845495  (BOLLARD ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9526012  (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9509103  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0407179  (BRISTOW HELICOPTERS [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4635030  (RAUCH SOL [CA])
 [A]  SCHUTTE, "An evaluation of a real-time fault diagnosis expert system for aircraft applications", IEEE PROCEEDINGS OF THE 28TH CONFERENCE ON DECISION AND CONTROL, LOS ANGELES, (198712), pages 1941 - 1947, XP002014263 [A] 1 * page 1942, column 1, line 21 - page 1943, column 1, line 32 *