blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0865880 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0865880



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 83
06.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.12.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.12.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
01.12.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
31.08.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
09.08.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.07.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.05.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
07.05.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
19.04.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
16.02.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.01.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
29.01.1999 Description Search / examination 1
29.01.1999 Description Search / examination 2
29.01.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.01.1999 Deletion of the entry relating to the representative ('et al' case) Search / examination 1
06.10.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.06.1998 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.05.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.11.1997 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
18.11.1997 Description Search / examination 4
20.05.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.05.1997 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
07.04.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.04.1997 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
07.03.1997 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.01.1997 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
24.01.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.01.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.12.1996 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.12.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.12.1996 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
09.12.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.12.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
09.12.1996 Description Search / examination 7
09.12.1996 Drawings Search / examination 2
09.12.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
09.12.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6