blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0865880


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]
18.02.2000 (Expected) grant published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
12.01.2000 Renewal fee
11.12.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant
26.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.04.1999 Definitive list of designations published on  02.06.1999 [1999/22]
12.02.1999 Change - representative published on  31.03.1999 [1999/13]
11.02.1999 Examination report or reply
16.12.1998 Renewal fee
02.10.1998 First examination report
01.10.1998 Examination report or reply
07.08.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.09.1998 [1998/39]
07.08.1998 Request for examination filed published on  23.09.1998 [1998/39]