blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0865880
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0865880Global Dossier 05.04.2000B1
EP0865880 23.09.1998A1
Priority number Date
EP96402671 09.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT191386T 15.04.2000T
Priority number Date
EP96402671 09.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69607645D 11.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
EP96402671 09.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69607645T 23.11.2000T2
Priority number Date
EP96402671 09.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0865880T 11.09.2000T3
Priority number Date
EP96402671 09.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2147352T 01.09.2000T3
Priority number Date
EP96402671 09.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GR3033912T 30.11.2000T3
Priority number Date
EP96402671 09.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT865880E 29.09.2000E
Priority number Date
EP96402671 09.12.1996