Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0865880

EP0865880 - Multifunctional pliers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETABLISSEMENTS PIERRE GREHAL ET COMPAGNIE SA
2 boulevard de la Gare
95350 Saint-Brice-sous-Forêt / FR
[1998/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Malagnoux, Roger
20 allée des Genêts
95200 Domont / FR
[1998/39]
Representative(s)Coester, Jacques Charles , et al
Cabinet Madeuf 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]Coester, Jacques Charles , et al
Cabinet Madeuf 7, rue de Monceau
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1998/39]Madeuf, René Louis , et al
Cabinet Madeuf, 7, rue de Monceau
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date96402671.009.12.1996
[1998/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0865880
Date:23.09.1998
Language:FR
[1998/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0865880
Date:05.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:B25B7/12, B26B17/02, B21D39/03
[1998/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/39]
TitleGerman:Mehrzweckzange[1998/39]
English:Multifunctional pliers[1998/39]
French:Pince d'usinage à fonctions multiples[1998/39]
Examination procedure12.12.1996Examination requested  [1998/39]
06.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.1999Fee for grant paid
01.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0103912  (WEIDMUELLER C A GMBH CO [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 4, line 3 - line 32; figures 1,8 *;
 [Y]DE4129685  (THOERNER WOLFGANG B [DE]) [Y] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]EP0203241  (GREHAL PIERRE ETS [FR]) [DA] 1,4-6 * abstract *;
 [A]US3354759  (COOK THOMAS L) [A] 2,3 * column 4, line 17 - line 26; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE4101284  (WEIDMUELLER C A GMBH CO [DE])
by applicantEP0203241