Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0730058

EP0730058 - Heating sandwich structure in particular for domestic appliances and domestic appliances with such a structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.04.2001 [2001/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEB S.A.
Les 4 M
Chemin du Petit Bois
69130 Ecully / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
SEB S.A.
Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois
69130 Ecully / FR
Former [1996/36]For all designated states
SEB S.A.
Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois
F-69130 Ecully / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Gelus, Dominique
Chaumont
38780 Eyzin / FR
02 / Brandolini, Jean Louis
L'Epicea, 118, Rue Crozet Boussingault
42100 Saint Etienne / FR
[1996/36]
Application number, filing date96420069.501.03.1996
[1996/36]
Priority number, dateFR1995000266602.03.1995         Original published format: FR 9502666
[1996/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0730058
Date:04.09.1996
Language:FR
[1996/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0730058
Date:09.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:D06F75/24, H05B3/30
[1996/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/36]
TitleGerman:Heizsandwichstruktur insbesondere für Haushaltgeräte und Haushaltgeräte mit einer solchen Struktur[1996/36]
English:Heating sandwich structure in particular for domestic appliances and domestic appliances with such a structure[1996/36]
French:Structure chauffante, notamment pour appareil electromenager, realisée selon une structure sandwich et appareil electromenager comportant une telle structure chauffante[1996/36]
Examination procedure16.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/41]
22.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.1999Fee for grant paid
24.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR07.07.2000
[2001/16]
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0555159  (SEB SA [FR]) [AD] 1-15 * column W *