Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0753923

EP0753923 - Method, device for producing a high voltage and installation for electrostatic spraying of a coating product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  15.04.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 12.07.2017  [2017/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAMES Technologies
13 Chemin de Malacher, ZIRST
38240 Meylan / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/07]For all designated states
SAMES Technologies
13 Chemin de Malacher, ZIRST
38240 Meylan / FR
Former [2002/06]For all designated states
SAMES S.A.
13 Chemin de Malacher - ZIRST, B.P. 86
F-38243 Meylan Cédex / FR
Former [2002/05]For all designated states
Binks Sames France SA
13 Chemin de Malacher, ZIRST
38240 Meylan / FR
Former [1997/03]For all designated states
SAMES S.A.
13 Chemin de Malacher - ZIRST, B.P. 86
F-38243 Meylan Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Burtin, Jean Pierre
9, rue des Glaneuses
38120 Saint-Egreve / FR
02 / Dobrowolski, Flavien
Le Grand Pré
38650 Sinard / FR
03 / Thome, Caryl
15, Rue Casimir Brenier
38120 Saint-Egreve / FR
[1997/03]
Representative(s)Lavoix
62, rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/03]Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre , et al
Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Application number, filing date96420231.105.07.1996
[1997/03]
Priority number, dateFR1995000862110.07.1995         Original published format: FR 9508621
[1997/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0753923
Date:15.01.1997
Language:FR
[1997/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0753923
Date:10.04.2002
Language:FR
[2002/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:H02H7/00, B05B5/053, B05B5/10
[1997/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1997/03]
TitleGerman:Verfahren, Einrichtung zur Erzeugung einer Hochspannung und Anlage zum Spritzen von Beschichtungsmaterialien[2016/28]
English:Method, device for producing a high voltage and installation for electrostatic spraying of a coating product[1997/03]
French:Procédés, dispositif d'élaboration de haute tension et installation de projection électrostatique de produit de revêtement[1997/03]
Former [1997/03]Verfahren, Einrichtung zum Herstellung höher Spannung und Anlage zum Spritzen von Beschichtungsmaterialien
Examination procedure14.02.1997Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/16]
13.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
08.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
03.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
05.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2001Fee for grant paid
21.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.01.2003  11.02.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Dürr Systems GmbH
Otto-Dürr-Strasse 9
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Heusler, Wolfgang
v. Bezold & Partner
Patentanwälte - PartG mbB
Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/11]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2003   
Dürr Systems GmbH
Otto-Dürr-Strasse 9
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Heusler, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
v. Bezold & Sozien Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
14.02.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.08.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.12.2012Date of oral proceedings
04.07.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.07.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.11.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.06.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
23.02.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
05.03.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/28]
Appeal following opposition13.09.2013Appeal received No.  T1977/13
14.11.2013Statement of grounds filed
12.11.2015Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
12.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
07.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
06.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE06.07.2005
BE31.07.2005
GB04.07.2016
[2016/47]
Former [2006/36]SE06.07.2005
BE31.07.2005
Former [2006/27]SE06.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0185311  (BEHR & SOHN HERMANN) [X] 2,7,8 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure 2 *;
 [DA]FR2618618  (GEMA RANSBURG AG) [DA] 1-3,7 * abstract *;
 [DA]WO9007381  (RANSBURG CORP) [DA] 1-3,7 * abstract *