Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0753923 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0753923



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1913
09.06.2017 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
09.06.2017 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
06.06.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.02.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.02.2017 Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) Opposition 3
23.02.2017 Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) Opposition 3
04.11.2016 Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit Opposition 2
13.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
17.06.2016 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
17.06.2016 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
17.06.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.06.2016 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
07.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.12.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 34
18.12.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Opposition 34
18.12.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.12.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Opposition 1
18.12.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Opposition 1
18.12.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.11.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Opposition 39
26.11.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 39
26.11.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Opposition 39
27.10.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
27.10.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
26.10.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
26.10.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
22.10.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
22.10.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
14.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 4
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 4
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 4
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 4
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 4
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 4
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
09.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 3
09.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
05.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 34
05.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
05.10.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.10.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.08.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
05.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.08.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
04.08.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
30.07.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.07.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
23.07.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
22.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.07.2015 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
20.07.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
16.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.07.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
15.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.07.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
06.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.07.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
02.07.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
02.07.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 14
29.06.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.05.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
18.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
12.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
12.03.2015 Claims Appeal 3
12.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.03.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
06.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.09.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 35
05.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.07.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.05.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
09.04.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
20.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
20.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
20.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
20.03.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.03.2014 Claims Appeal 4
20.03.2014 Claims Appeal 2
20.03.2014 Claims Appeal 2
20.03.2014 Claims Appeal 4
20.03.2014 Claims Appeal 2
20.03.2014 Claims Appeal 2
20.03.2014 Claims Appeal 3
20.03.2014 Claims Appeal 2
20.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
20.03.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 23
20.11.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.11.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 35
14.11.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 35
23.09.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.09.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
16.09.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
13.09.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
13.09.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
13.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
23.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.07.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
04.07.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
04.07.2013 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 11
04.07.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 23
04.07.2013 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
04.07.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.07.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
04.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
04.07.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.07.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 14
04.07.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.12.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 18
16.11.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.11.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
16.11.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
23.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.08.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
08.08.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
08.08.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.08.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
08.08.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.08.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.08.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 18
08.08.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.08.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 118
08.08.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.08.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.08.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.08.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.06.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 24
14.12.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.12.2011 Annex Opposition 4
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 1
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Claims Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.12.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 24
13.12.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.12.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.08.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.08.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.08.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.08.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.08.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
09.08.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.07.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.07.2011 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 8
20.07.2011 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 8
20.07.2011 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 8
20.07.2011 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 8
20.07.2011 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 8
18.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.07.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
13.07.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.07.2011 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.07.2011 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.07.2011 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
13.07.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
01.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.07.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
26.04.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.04.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
20.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2006 Claims Opposition 3
24.06.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
15.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
30.12.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.12.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
21.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
21.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
21.09.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
09.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.08.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.07.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.07.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
07.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.11.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2004 Claims Opposition 3
28.10.2004 Claims Opposition 3
28.10.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
26.10.2004 Claims Opposition 3
26.10.2004 Claims Opposition 3
26.10.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
30.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.09.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.06.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.02.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2004 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
26.01.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
26.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.01.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.09.2003 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2003 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.08.2003 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
13.08.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
16.06.2003 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.06.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.06.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.06.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.02.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.02.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.02.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.01.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
07.01.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 58
07.01.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.01.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
07.01.2003 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
07.01.2003 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
07.01.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
07.01.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
07.01.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.01.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Opposition 1
28.02.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.01.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
21.12.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.12.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.12.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
20.12.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
18.12.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
22.11.2001 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 9
22.11.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
05.10.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
05.10.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
03.08.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
03.08.2001 Reply to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.04.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.04.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
02.03.2001 Preparation of grant Search / examination 2
11.08.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
11.08.2000 Description Search / examination 10
11.08.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.08.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
07.08.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
31.07.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.07.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.07.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.05.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.05.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.01.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
14.02.1997 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
14.02.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
14.02.1997 Description Search / examination 2
31.10.1996 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.1996 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
15.10.1996 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
05.09.1996 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
22.08.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.08.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
05.07.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.07.1996 Claims Search / examination 3
05.07.1996 Description Search / examination 10
05.07.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.07.1996 Drawings Search / examination 2
05.07.1996 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
05.07.1996 Priority document Search / examination 20
05.07.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7