Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0751278

EP0751278 - Motorized roller shutter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BUBENDORFF VOLET ROULANT
41, rue Lectoure
68300 Saint-Louis / FR
[2000/15]
Former [1997/01]For all designated states
BUBENDORFF S.A.
41, rue de Lectoure
F-68300 Saint-Louis / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bubendorf, Robert
48, Rue de Wilson
68220 Attenschwiller / FR
02 / Blary, Christophe
14, rue des Merles
68370 Michelbach-le-Bas / FR
03 / Evreux, Gérard
"Les Coteaux"
74130 Ayze / FR
[1997/01]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/01]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 10, rue Contades
67300 Schiltigheim / FR
Application number, filing date96440048.513.06.1996
[1997/01]
Priority number, dateFR1995000796728.06.1995         Original published format: FR 9507967
FR1996000063917.01.1996         Original published format: FR 9600639
[1997/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0751278
Date:02.01.1997
Language:FR
[1997/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0751278
Date:05.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/74
[1997/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/01]
TitleGerman:Motorisierter Rolladen[1997/01]
English:Motorized roller shutter[1997/01]
French:Volet roulant motorisé[1997/01]
Examination procedure22.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/17]
02.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1999Fee for grant paid
04.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
BE30.06.2000
CH30.06.2000
LI30.06.2000
[2003/09]
Former [2002/10]AT05.01.2000
BE30.06.2000
CH30.06.2000
LI30.06.2000
Former [2001/22]AT05.01.2000
BE30.06.2000
Former [2001/08]AT05.01.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2631076  (TECHNIGROUP [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE9416817U  (MAUDERER LEICHTMETALLBAU [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3504489  (HUBER LOTHAR, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3132073  (SCHENKER EMIL AG [CH]) [X] 1 * the whole document *