Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0728690

EP0728690 - Machine for spreading fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.04.2001 [2001/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Balsells Ventura, Angel
Ctra. Nacional II, Km.551,9
E-08711 Odena (Barcelona) / ES
[1996/35]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1996/35]
Representative(s)Durán Moya, Luis-Alfonso , et al
DURAN-CORRETJER
Còrsega, 329
(Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal)
08037 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]Duran Moya, Luis-Alfonso , et al
DURAN-CORRETJER, S.L., Paseo de Gracia, 101
08008 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date96500024.326.02.1996
[1996/35]
Priority number, dateES1995000037527.02.1995         Original published format: ES 9500375
[1996/35]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0728690
Date:28.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0728690
Date:25.09.1996
[1996/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0728690
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:B65H16/10, B65H45/103
[1996/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/35]
TitleGerman:Maschine zum Ausbreiten von Stoff[1996/35]
English:Machine for spreading fabric[1996/35]
French:Machine pour déployer du tissu[1996/35]
Examination procedure13.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/19]
10.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.1999Fee for grant paid
25.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8904123  (NIEBUHR MASKINFABRIK [DK]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 14 - line 22; figure - *;
 [A]GB2060724  (ROCKWELL RIMOLDI SPA & OFFICIA) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]FR2503113  (STUMPF G O GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 29; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4676494  (SMITH HOYT L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 10 - line 13; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5029827  (SMITH HOYT L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 8 - line 14; figure - *;
 [A]DE2857481  (STUMPF GUENTER O) [A] 1,2 * figure - *