Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0771046

EP0771046 - Antenna connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
P.O. Box 86
24101 Salo / FI
[1997/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Eerikäinen, Jukka
Paavo Kolin katu 10 A 3
33720 Tampere / FI
[1997/18]
Representative(s)Heikkinen, Esko Juhani
Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [1997/18]Heikkinen, Esko Juhani
Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date96660073.622.10.1996
[1997/18]
Priority number, dateFI1995000512527.10.1995         Original published format: FI 955125
[1997/18]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0771046
Date:02.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0771046
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/24, H01R13/71
[1997/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1997/18]
TitleGerman:Antennensteckverbindung[1997/18]
English:Antenna connector[1997/18]
French:Connecteur d'antenne[1997/18]
Examination procedure24.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/28]
08.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
01.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2000Fee for grant paid
07.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0601702  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 12; figure 4 *;
 [X]GB2195841  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3,8-10 * page 2, line 1 - line 61; figure 1 *;
 [X]US5278570  (JARAMILLO GIOVANNI [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8-10 * column 2, line 21 - line 64; figures 1,3 *
ExaminationUS5336896
 US4350408