Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0734930

EP0734930 - Aerial transport system with rails [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glassey, Paul
Sornard
CH-1997 Haute-Nendaz / CH
[1996/40]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1996/40]
Representative(s)Schick, Carl , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Gotthardstrasse 53
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Schick, Carl , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
Former [1996/40]Schick, Carl , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Patentanwälte Postfach 6940
8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date96810165.915.03.1996
[1996/40]
Priority number, dateCH1995000088729.03.1995         Original published format: CH 88795
[1996/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0734930
Date:02.10.1996
Language:FR
[1996/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0734930
Date:31.05.2000
Language:FR
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:B61B3/00, B61B9/00
[1996/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   IT [1996/40]
TitleGerman:Schwebebahn-Transportsystem mit Schienen[1996/40]
English:Aerial transport system with rails[1996/40]
French:Installation de transport aérien par rail[1996/40]
Examination procedure06.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/18]
16.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2000Fee for grant paid
03.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199803   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.1998
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT31.05.2000
DE01.09.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2002/13]DE01.09.2000
Documents cited:Search[XA]US3541962  (AVERY WILLIAM H) [X] 1 * column 7, line 20 - column 9, line 75; figures 3-5,8-11 * [A] 6,9;
 [A]DE217727  (J. POHLIG AG ET W. ELLINGEN) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3834316  (HENNINGS W) [A] 1,2,9 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 22; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0129767  (MUCKENHAUPT GMBH [DE]) [A] 10 * page 4, line 22 - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *