Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0736653

EP0736653 - Rotary lock cylinder for a security lock [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Keller, Ernst
Untere Schwandenstrasse 22
CH-8805 Richterswil / CH
[1996/41]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1996/41]
Representative(s)Groner, Manfred , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Gotthardstrasse 53
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1996/41]Groner, Manfred , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date96810168.318.03.1996
[1996/41]
Priority number, dateCH1995000095504.04.1995         Original published format: CH 95595
[1996/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0736653
Date:09.10.1996
Language:DE
[1996/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0736653
Date:02.04.1997
[1997/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0736653
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:E05B9/10, E05B15/00
[1997/13]
Former International [1996/41]E05B15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/41]
TitleGerman:Drehschliesszylinder für ein Sicherheitsschloss[1996/41]
English:Rotary lock cylinder for a security lock[1996/41]
French:Cylindre de serrure rotatif pour une serrure de sécurité[1996/41]
Examination procedure07.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/41]
10.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.1999Fee for grant paid
15.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI26.04.2000
GR26.04.2000
DK26.07.2000
PT26.07.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/46]FI26.04.2000
DK26.07.2000
PT26.07.2000
Former [2001/29]FI26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
Former [2001/16]PT26.07.2000
Documents cited:Search[DA]CH626679  (KELLER ERNST [CH]) [DA] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [DA]CH679169  (KELLER ERNST) [DA] 1,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0022233  (CISA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,8,9 * page 6, lines 20-25; figures 1,4 *