Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0741019

EP0741019 - Individually driven folding apparatus for a rotary printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maschinenfabrik Wifag
Wylerringstrasse 39 Postfach
3001 Bern / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
Maschinenfabrik Wifag
Wylerringstrasse 39 Postfach
3001 Bern / CH
Former [1996/45]For all designated states
Maschinenfabrik Wifag
Wylerringstrasse 39 Postfach
CH-3001 Bern / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Zweifel, Johann
Feldackerweg 1
3067 Boll / CH
02 / Treuthardt, Thomas
Ballmoosweg 6c
3033 Wohlen / CH
[1996/45]
Representative(s)Wess, Wolfgang , et al
Schwabe Sandmair Marx
Patentanwälte
P.O. Box 86 02 45
81629 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Wess, Wolfgang , et al
Schwabe Sandmair Marx Patentanwälte P.O. Box 86 02 45
81629 München / DE
Former [1999/02]Wess, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx P.O. Box 86 02 45
81629 München / DE
Application number, filing date96810253.319.04.1996
[1996/45]
Priority number, dateDE199511644304.05.1995         Original published format: DE 19516443
[1996/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0741019
Date:06.11.1996
Language:DE
[1996/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0741019
Date:01.10.1997
[1997/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0741019
Date:28.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/26]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0741019
Date:23.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:B41F13/60, B41F13/008, B41F13/00
[1996/45]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/45]
TitleGerman:Einzeln angetriebener Falzapparat für eine Rotationsdruckmaschine[1996/45]
English:Individually driven folding apparatus for a rotary printing machine[1996/45]
French:Appareil de pliage entraîné individuellement pour une machine d'impression rotative[1996/45]
Examination procedure03.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/18]
08.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2000Fee for grant paid
23.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.03.2001  09.04.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft -Lizenzen-Patente-
Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4
97080 Würzburg / DE
 02  28.03.2001  09.04.2001  ADMISSIBLE
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Postfach 10 00 96
86135 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Matthes, Klaus
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Postfach 10 00 96
86135 Augsburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2001/22]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2001  09.04.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft -Lizenzen-Patente-
Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4
97080 Würzburg / DE
 02  28.03.2001  09.04.2001  ADMISSIBLE
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Stadtbachstrasse 1 Postfach 10 00 96
D-86135 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Matthes, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Postfach 10 00 96
86135 Augsburg / DE
Former [2001/21]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2001  09.04.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft -Lizenzen-Patente-
Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4
97080 Würzburg / DE
 02  28.03.2001  09.04.2001  ADMISSIBLE
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Stadtbachstrasse 1 Postfach 10 00 96
D-86135 Augsburg / DE
07.05.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.11.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.06.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.06.2002Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.07.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.12.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
20.02.2003Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.07.1996FI   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.1996
07.11.1996GB   M01   Fee paid on   19.11.1996
07.11.1996IT   M01   Fee paid on   19.11.1996
07.11.1996NL   M01   Fee paid on   19.11.1996
07.11.1996SE   M01   Fee paid on   19.11.1996
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE2046131  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,8-12 * page 1, paragraph L - page 2, line L; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [Y] 13;
 [XY]EP0567741  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG) [X] 1-9 * Zusammenfassung; column 3, line 21 - column 6, line 7; figures 1-3; claims 1-6 * [Y] 10-17;
 [X]GB2149149  (ROCKWELL GRAPHIC SYSTEMS LIMITED) [X] 1,8,9 * Zusammenfassung; page 1, line 5 - line 103; figure 1 *;
 [XP]EP0699524  (MAN-ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [XP] 1,3,7-9,14-16 * Zusammenfassung; column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 16; figures 21,22; claims 1,7 *;
 [YD]DE4127321  (MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG) [YD] 10-17 * column 3, line 7 - line 67; figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]DE2614665  (MASCHINENFABRIK WIFAG) [Y] 13 * siehe das ganze Dokument *;
 [A]US5405127  (RONALD D. WELBORN) [A] 1,9,13 * Zusammenfassung; column 1, line 8 - column 4, line 11; figures 1,2,7-9 *
Examination   - BORIS FUCHS, "Color-Management-Systeme, Computer-to-plate ...", DEUTSCHE DRUCKER, (19950413), no. 14, pages W46 - W53
    - BORIS FUCHS, "Rotationsmaschinenantrieb ohne Längswelle - eine Wiederentdeckung von Hamada", ZEITUNGSTECHNIK, (19911201), pages 78 - 80
OppositionDE2107595
 US2022696
 EP0581179
 EP0520967
 WO9629204
 DE19509948
    - "Konstruktionselemente des Maschinenbaues", Tochtermann/Bodenstein, Springer Verlag, Berlin Heidelberg New York, 9. Auflage, 1979, Seiten 154-159, Seiten 278-287
    - Prospekt ROTOMAN M von MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, RA ROTO 08.93.1 Augsburg
    - ALEXANDER BRAUN: "Atlas des Zeitungs- und Illustrationsdruckes", Polygraph Verlag GmbH, Frankfurt am Main, 1960, Seiten 71 und 189