EP0764526 - Device for printing sample cards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polytex AG Grundstrasse 1 5012 Schönenwerd / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states POLYTEX AG Grundstrasse 1 5012 Schönenwerd / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohner, Hans Stichweg 7 5024 Küttigen / CH | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich) Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Patentanwaltsbüro Feldmann AG Kanalstrasse 17 8152 Glattbrugg / CH | Application number, filing date | 96810531.2 | 12.08.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | CH19950002542 | 07.09.1995 Original published format: CH 254295 | [1997/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0764526 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0764526 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764526 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/01, B41J13/00, B41J13/12, B41J13/10 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
B41J13/12 (EP);
B41J2/01 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/13] | B41J2/01, B41J13/00, B41J13/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Bedrucken von Musterkarten | [1997/13] | English: | Device for printing sample cards | [1997/13] | French: | Dispositif d'impression de cartes d'échantillons | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 09.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 19.04.2000 | FR | 19.04.2000 | GB | 19.04.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/27] | ES | 19.04.2000 | |
GB | 19.04.2000 | ||
FR | 15.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | GB | 19.04.2000 | |
FR | 15.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | GB | 19.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3531251 (C. & H. LEUTHÄUßER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS61293877 ; | [A]EP0558419 (SONY CORPORATION) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870523), vol. 011, no. 160, Database accession no. (M - 592), & JP61293877 A 19861224 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |