Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0832702

EP0832702 - Method for making hollow bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.10.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.12.2001 [2001/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcan Technology & Management AG
Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
[2001/46]
Former [1998/14]For all designated states
Alusuisse Technology & Management AG
Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Wehner, Frank, Dr.
Reitergässle 10
78256 Steisslingen / DE
02 / Springe, Gerd, Dr.
Im Dullennest 4
78337 Wangen/Oehningen / DE
[1998/14]
Application number, filing date96810628.625.09.1996
[1998/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0832702
Date:01.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0832702
Date:13.12.2000
Language:DE
[2000/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:B21D26/02
[1998/14]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/50]
Former [1999/46]CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI 
Former [1998/51]CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI 
Former [1998/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hohlkörpern[1998/14]
English:Method for making hollow bodies[1998/14]
French:Méthode de fabrication de corps creux[1998/14]
Examination procedure01.10.1998Examination requested  [1998/49]
12.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2000Fee for grant paid
05.09.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.09.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1959999  (IBM) [X] 1-3,9 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH04187325  ;
 [X]JPH04157141  ;
 [X]JPH04167931  ;
 [X]JPH04187325  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,3,9 * figure - *;
 [X]JPH04157141  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,3,9 * figure - *;
 [X]JPH08197152  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,3,9 * pages 6-8-96; figure - *;
 [X]JPH04167931  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,4-6 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0548859  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 2,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4269053  (AGRAWAL SUPHAL P, et al)
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921020), vol. 016, no. 507, Database accession no. (M - 1327), [X] 1,3,9 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920918), vol. 016, no. 449, Database accession no. (C - 0986), [X] 1,3,9 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920929), vol. 016, no. 467, Database accession no. (M - 1317), [X] 1,4-6 * abstract *